TN SB0743 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/25/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/25/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies that public charter schools and the state board of education are prohibited from employing individuals found by the department of children's services to have committed an act of child abuse in the same manner as other educational entities; clarifies that the state board is prohibited from granting, reactivating, or restoring an educator license or temporary teaching permit for such individuals; adds the state board and public charter schools to the list of educational entities to which the department is required to make certain disclosures when one of its employees is alleged to have committed an act of child abuse. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 5, relative to individuals prohibited from employment with an educational entity.
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn White [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Effective date(s) 04/25/2023 | |
2023-05-03 | Pub. Ch. 222 | |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2023-04-12 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2023-04-10 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2023-04-10 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2023-03-02 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/27/2023 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/15/2023 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0459 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 222