TN SB0740 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 337
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 337
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates The Plaza in Nashville as a premier type tourist resort for purposes of on-premises consumption of alcoholic beverages. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102.
Title
As enacted, designates The Plaza in Nashville as a premier type tourist resort for purposes of on-premises consumption of alcoholic beverages. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/ amendment(s), refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/ amendment(s), refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Pub. Ch. 337 | |
2017-05-19 | Effective date(s) 05/09/2017 | |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-05-03 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-05-01 | House | Passed H., Ayes 69, Nays 17, PNV 5 |
2017-05-01 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0106) |
2017-05-01 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-03-06 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 25, Nays 5 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0026) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/2/2017 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/21/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0722 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 337