TN SB0735 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires an application for an absentee ballot to contain only the last four digits of the voter's social security number rather than the entire social security number of the voter. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, requires an application for an absentee ballot to contain only the last four digits of the voter's social security number rather than the entire social security number of the voter. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0878 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-20 - Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee