TN SB0717 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 262
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 262
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires a seller of real property to disclose to a buyer the presence of any known sinkhole on the property. - Amends TCA Title 66.
Title
As enacted, requires a seller of real property to disclose to a buyer the presence of any known sinkhole on the property. - Amends TCA Title 66.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Green [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-30 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 262 | |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/6/2015 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/6/2015 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/2/2015 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/30/2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/30/2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/17/2015 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/17/2015 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/10/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0796 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-30 - Pub. Ch. 262