TN SB0712 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-21 - Pub. Ch. 162
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-21 - Pub. Ch. 162
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, "Jerry Lee Lewis Highway," segment of State Route 176 (Getwell Road) in Shelby County.
Title
As enacted, "Jerry Lee Lewis Highway," segment of State Route 176 (Getwell Road) in Shelby County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - Senate - S. TRANS COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - Senate - S. TRANS COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-21 | Pub. Ch. 162 | |
2009-05-21 | Effective date(s) 05/07/09 | |
2009-05-07 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-04-30 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2009-04-29 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-04-29 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-04-28 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2009-04-27 | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0 | |
2009-04-27 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2009-04-13 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2009-04-09 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2009-04-09 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 33, Nays 0 | |
2009-04-09 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0100) | |
2009-04-07 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 04/09/2009 | |
2009-04-06 | S. Reset on cal. for 04/09/09 | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 04/06/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Rec. for pass; ref to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 04/01/2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 00 | |
2009-03-19 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 03/24/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0231 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 162