TN SB0709 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 112
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 112
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the commissioners of health and mental health and substance abuse services to produce guidelines on nonresidential buprenorphine treatment by January 1, 2018, and to annually update those guidelines. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 1.
Title
As enacted, requires the commissioners of health and mental health and substance abuse services to produce guidelines on nonresidential buprenorphine treatment by January 1, 2018, and to annually update those guidelines. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Richard Briggs [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] |
Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 2 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | Pub. Ch. 112 | |
2017-04-19 | Effective date(s) 04/07/2017 | |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-03-29 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 (Amendment 2 - HA0095) |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 3/27/2017 |
2017-03-20 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-03-20 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0095) |
2017-03-20 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0094) |
2017-03-20 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-03-09 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0057) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/6/2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/1/2017 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0746 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 112