TN SB0704 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Pub. Ch. 135
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Pub. Ch. 135
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that the annual planting and harvest seasons for the state extend from January 1 to December 31 of each year. - Amends TCA Title 43, Chapter 1, Part 1 and Title 70, Chapter 8, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, specifies that the annual planting and harvest seasons for the state extend from January 1 to December 31 of each year. - Amends TCA Title 43, Chapter 1, Part 1 and Title 70, Chapter 8, Part 2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | Pub. Ch. 135 | |
2015-04-27 | Effective date(s) 04/16/2015 | |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2015-04-06 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2015-04-01 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2015-03-30 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-30 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2015-03-30 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0102) |
2015-03-30 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2015-03-12 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment 1 |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/9/2015 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/4/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0716 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-27 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 135