TN SB0696 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Genetically Engineered Food Labeling Act." - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18, Part 1 and Title 53.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the "Genetically Engineered Food Labeling Act." - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18, Part 1 and Title 53.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-15SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2016-03-09SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/15/2016
2015-03-31SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2015-03-24SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/31/2015
2015-03-24SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/30/2015
2015-03-18SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/24/2015
2015-02-18SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2015-02-12SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2015-02-11SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1218 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-15 - Failed in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee of Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback