TN HB1218 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-15 - Failed in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee of Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Genetically Engineered Food Labeling Act." - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18, Part 1 and Title 53.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the "Genetically Engineered Food Labeling Act." - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18, Part 1 and Title 53.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-15HouseFailed in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee of Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
2016-03-09HousePlaced on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/15/2016
2015-03-25HouseAction Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 2016
2015-03-24HouseAction Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/25/2015
2015-03-18HousePlaced on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/24/2015
2015-02-24HouseAssigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
2015-02-23HouseP2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee--Government Operations for review
2015-02-18HouseP1C.
2015-02-12HouseIntro.
2015-02-12HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0696 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback