TN SB0688 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-19 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C&L Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-19 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C&L Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires commissioner of commerce and insurance to reinstate the review of the impact of 2004 workers compensation reform legislation which ended in 2010 and continue such review through 2015. - Amends TCA Title 50.
Title
As introduced, requires commissioner of commerce and insurance to reinstate the review of the impact of 2004 workers compensation reform legislation which ended in 2010 and continue such review through 2015. - Amends TCA Title 50.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-19 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C&L Comm. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/19/2013 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0688&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB0688.pdf |