TN SB0673 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-05 - Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-05 - Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires service of a certain percentage of the sentence that certain repeat offenders receive upon conviction for aggravated robbery with a firearm. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 35.
Title
As introduced, requires service of a certain percentage of the sentence that certain repeat offenders receive upon conviction for aggravated robbery with a firearm. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 35.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-01 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-01 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-01 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-05 | Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-06-04 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/05/2010 | |
2010-06-04 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/04/2010 | |
2010-06-03 | S. Reset on Cal. for 6/4/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (3) cal. for 06/03/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (3) cal. for 06/02/2010 | |
2010-06-01 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2010-05-28 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/01/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | Action def. in FW&M Comm to 6/1/10 | |
2010-05-27 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/27/2010 | |
2010-05-26 | Action def. in FW&M comm to 5/27/10 | |
2010-05-26 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/26/2010 | |
2010-05-25 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/26/2010 | |
2010-05-25 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/25/2010 | |
2010-05-18 | Action def. in S. F,W&M Comm. to next cal. | |
2010-05-17 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/18/2010 | |
2010-05-17 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/18/2010 | |
2010-05-14 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/17/2010 | |
2010-05-11 | Action def. in S. F,W&M to last cal. | |
2010-05-06 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/11/2010 | |
2010-05-05 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/11/2010 | |
2010-05-05 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/05/2010 | |
2010-05-04 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/5/2010 | |
2010-04-29 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/04/2010 | |
2010-04-20 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/4/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 04/20/2010 | |
2010-04-13 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/20/2010 | |
2010-04-08 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 04/13/2010 | |
2009-06-18 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm. | |
2009-06-18 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/18/2009 | |
2009-06-16 | Action def. in FW&M Comm to 6-17-09 | |
2009-06-16 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/16/2009 | |
2009-06-15 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 6/16/2009 | |
2009-06-15 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/15/2009 | |
2009-06-12 | Action def. in S. FW&M Comm to 6/12/2009 | |
2009-06-11 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/12/2009 | |
2009-06-11 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 6/12/2009 | |
2009-06-11 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/11/2009 | |
2009-06-10 | Action def. in S. FW&M Comm to 6/11/2009 | |
2009-06-10 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/10/2009 | |
2009-06-09 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 6/10/2009 | |
2009-06-04 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/09/2009 | |
2009-06-03 | Action def. in S. F,W&M Comm. to next cal. | |
2009-06-02 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm cal. for 6/3/2009 | |
2009-06-02 | Action def. in S. F,W&M Comm to 6/3/09 | |
2009-05-28 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/02/2009 | |
2009-04-14 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. FW&M Comm. | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/14/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/15/2009 | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/08/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/8/2009 | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/01/2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/1/2009 | |
2009-03-19 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 03/25/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0607 (Crossfiled) 2009-06-17 - Rcvd. from H., P1C.