TN SB0667 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requests the department and its division of health related boards to perform a study on the licensure and regulation of cannabis for medical use by departments of health and medical professional licensing boards in states contiguous to Tennessee and report findings to the general assembly's health committees by December 15, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 4, Chapter 3; Title 38, Chapter 3; Title 39, Chapter 17; Title 43; Title 50; Title 53; Title 63; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 4, Chapter 3; Title 38, Chapter 3; Title 39, Chapter 17; Title 43; Title 50; Title 53; Title 63; Title 67 and Title 68, relative to cannabis for medical use.
Sponsors
Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Katrina Robinson [D] | Sen. Art Swann [R] | Sen. Todd Gardenhire [R] |
Sen. Edward Jackson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 5, Nays 3 PNV 1 (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 5, Nays 3 PNV 1 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health & Welfare Committee to 3/24/21 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health & Welfare Committee to 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/10/2021 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0880 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-27 - Failed in Criminal Justice Committee