TN SB0651 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 509
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 509
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the department of safety to develop an electronic driver license system in which licensees may participate; permits development of a mobile application to display images of driver licenses on cell phones; allows electronic driver licenses to be accepted in lieu of physical driver licenses. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 50.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the department of safety to develop an electronic driver license system in which licensees may participate; permits development of a mobile application to display images of driver licenses on cell phones; allows electronic driver licenses to be accepted in lieu of physical driver licenses. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 50.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 509 | |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/22/2015 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/21/2015 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. on 4/16/15 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/18/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0556 (Crossfiled) 2015-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 509