TN SB0647 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows a person to have the right of suffrage restored if the person has entered into an agreement to pay the full amount of restitution owed to a victim in reasonable installments and is current on such installments. - Amends TCA Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 40, relative to restoration of rights of citizenship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee (Y: 2 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Senate | Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/20/2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/20/2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/16/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1393 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee