TN SB0644 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-18 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-18 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes the reciprocity provision that out-of-state employees who are temporarily performing services in this state are exempt from the Tennessee Workers' Compensation Law when certain requirements are met for purposes of construction services providers, and instead, requires that out-of-state construction services providers and their employers comply with the Tennessee Workers' Compensation Law. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 6 and Title 56.
Title
As introduced, removes the reciprocity provision that out-of-state employees who are temporarily performing services in this state are exempt from the Tennessee Workers' Compensation Law when certain requirements are met for purposes of construction services providers, and instead, requires that out-of-state construction services providers and their employers comply with the Tennessee Workers' Compensation Law. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 6 and Title 56.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0654 (Crossfiled) 2015-02-23 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0644&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB0644.pdf |