TN SB0640 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to first calendar of 2022
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to first calendar of 2022
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires youth development centers and detention centers to teach certain life skills to children held in these facilities. - Amends TCA Title 37 and Title 41.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37 and Title 41, relative to the curriculum taught in facilities for juveniles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to first calendar of 2022 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/20/2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/20/2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1307 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-24 - Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee