TN SB0636 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/23/2019
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Apr 23 @ 1:00 pm in Cordell Hull Building
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, adds physician assistants to the list of medical practitioners who are qualified to draw blood from a motor vehicle operator for evidentiary purposes in a DUI investigation. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, adds physician assistants to the list of medical practitioners who are qualified to draw blood from a motor vehicle operator for evidentiary purposes in a DUI investigation. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 4.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/23/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1162 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-17 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback