TN HB1162 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, adds physician assistants to the list of medical practitioners who are qualified to draw blood from a motor vehicle operator for evidentiary purposes in a DUI investigation. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, adds physician assistants to the list of medical practitioners who are qualified to draw blood from a motor vehicle operator for evidentiary purposes in a DUI investigation. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 4.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-16HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-15HousePassed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-11HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/15/2019
2019-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2019
2019-04-03HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-27HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 4/3/2019
2019-03-27HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary
2019-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0636 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-17 - Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/23/2019

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback