TN SB0634 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Sponsor change.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, increases from three to four the number of copies of a plan of services that a municipality must provide for public inspection in connection with a proposed annexation. - Amends TCA Title 6 and Title 68, Chapter 221.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 6 and Title 68, Chapter 221, relative to municipal services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-08SenateSponsor change.
2023-02-02SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2023-01-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-26SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1064 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-02 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback