TN SB0633 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 381
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 381
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits a current early service retiree from changing to disability retirement; makes other revisions to provisions governing the Tennessee consolidated retirement system. - Amends TCA Section 8-25-204; Section 8-25-205; Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35; Title 8, Chapter 36 and Title 8, Chapter 37.
Title
As enacted, prohibits a current early service retiree from changing to disability retirement; makes other revisions to provisions governing the Tennessee consolidated retirement system. - Amends TCA Section 8-25-204; Section 8-25-205; Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35; Title 8, Chapter 36 and Title 8, Chapter 37.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Pub. Ch. 381 | |
2019-05-15 | Effective date(s) 05/10/2019 | |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-05-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-30 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0064) |
2019-04-30 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-03-21 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0106) |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0087) |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/18/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/12/2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1022 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 381