TN SB0632 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Pub. Ch. 464
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Pub. Ch. 464
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, permits the alteration of a wet weather conveyance by any activity and does not require any notice or approval of the alteration, if certain conditions are met; allows person desiring to alter a specific water of the state to request a determination from the commissioner that it is a wet weather conveyance and submit a report from a qualified hydrologic professional in support of the request. - Amends TCA Title 69, Chapter 3, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, permits the alteration of a wet weather conveyance by any activity and does not require any notice or approval of the alteration, if certain conditions are met; allows person desiring to alter a specific water of the state to request a determination from the commissioner that it is a wet weather conveyance and submit a report from a qualified hydrologic professional in support of the request. - Amends TCA Title 69, Chapter 3, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 2 BY Southerland (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-12 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-17 - Senate - S. E,C&T COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 2 BY Southerland (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-12 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-17 - Senate - S. E,C&T COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-01 | Pub. Ch. 464 | |
2009-07-01 | Effective date(s) 06/23/09 | |
2009-06-23 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-06-12 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2009-06-08 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-06-04 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-06-03 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2009-06-01 | Passed H., Ayes 72, Nays 22 | |
2009-06-01 | Am. no. 3 tabled Ayes 52, Nays 41 | |
2009-06-01 | Am. no. 2 tabled, Ayes 53, Nays 40 | |
2009-06-01 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0568) | |
2009-06-01 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2009-05-26 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2009-05-21 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2009-05-21 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 26, Nays 3, PNV 1 | |
2009-05-21 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 3 - SA0590) | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 05/21/2009 | |
2009-05-18 | S. Reset on cal. for 05/21/2009 | |
2009-05-18 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA0555) | |
2009-05-18 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0535) | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 05/18/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/12/2009 | |
2009-03-17 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. FW&M Comm. | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on S. E,C&T Comm. cal. for 03/17/2009 | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. E,C&T Comm. | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. E,C&T Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-10 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1615 (Crossfiled) 2009-07-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 464