TN SB0624 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-18 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-18 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits disclosure of certain information by an advocate in regard to a victim of domestic violence, sexual assault, stalking, or human trafficking in a judicial, legislative, or administrative proceeding unless the victim gives express written consent. - Amends TCA Title 24; Title 36 and Title 39.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 24; Title 36 and Title 39, relative to an advocate's communications.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0047) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/15/2021 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/9/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0673 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-13 - Failed in Criminal Justice Committee