TN SB0623 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Pub. Ch. 493
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, deletes several obsolete provisions and makes various substantive changes to education laws; establishes parameters for the teaching of certain concepts related to race and sex. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4 and Title 49, relative to education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Previous Question Motion to Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Table Minority Report Motion to Substitute Conference Committee Report (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 65 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 69 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT MINORITY REPORT (Y: 67 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 21 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01 Pub. Ch. 493
2021-06-01 Effective date(s) 05/25/2021
2021-05-25SenateSigned by Governor.
2021-05-17SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2021-05-13HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-05-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-05-12SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-05-05HouseConf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 69, Nays 20, PNV 0
2021-05-05SenateConference Committee report adopted, 25 ayes, 7 nays, PNV 1
2021-05-05HouseConf. comm. appointed Reps. Ragan, Cepicky, White, and Hakeem.
2021-05-05HouseH. Placed on Message Calendar for 5/5/21
2021-05-05SenateConference Committee appointed. (Roberts, Kelsey, Bell, Gilmore, Johnson)
2021-05-05SenateSenate refused to recede from its non-concurrence.
2021-05-05SenatePlaced on Senate Message Calendar for 5/5/2021
2021-05-04HouseH. refused to recede from its non-concurrence
2021-05-04HouseH. Placed on Message Calendar #2 for 5/4/21
2021-05-04SenateSenate refused to concur in amendment
2021-05-04SenatePlaced on Senate Message Calendar 2 for 5/4/2021
2021-05-04HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 69, Nays 23, PNV 1
2021-05-04HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0332)
2021-05-04HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0441)
2021-05-04HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2021-04-05HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2021-04-01SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-04-01SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2021-04-01SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0144)
2021-03-30SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/1/2021
2021-03-24SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
2021-03-18SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/24/2021
2021-03-17SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/24/2021
2021-03-10SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/17/2021
2021-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2021-02-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0580 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 493

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback