TN HB0580 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 57-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 493
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, deletes several obsolete provisions and makes various substantive changes to education laws; establishes parameters for the teaching of certain concepts related to race and sex. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4 and Title 49, relative to education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 493
2021-05-04HouseComp. SB subst.
2021-05-04HouseSponsor(s) withdrawn.
2021-05-04HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-05-03HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2021
2021-05-03HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/3/2021
2021-05-03HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-04-29HousePlaced on cal. Education Administration for 5/3/2021
2021-04-28HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-04-28HouseRe-ref. Education Administration
2021-04-27HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-04-22HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/28/2021
2021-04-21HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/22/2021
2021-04-19HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-04-15HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/19/2021
2021-04-14HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
2021-04-07HousePlaced on cal. Education Administration for 4/14/2021
2021-04-07HouseAction def. in Education Administration to 4/14/2021
2021-03-31HousePlaced on cal. Education Administration for 4/7/2021
2021-03-30HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration
2021-03-24HousePlaced on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/30/2021
2021-03-17HouseAssigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
2021-03-17HouseRef. to Education Administration -- Government Operations for Review
2021-03-08HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-02-10HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2021-02-08HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0623 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/25/2021

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback