TN SB0619 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 977
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 977
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires each local board of education to develop a policy to implement a program to reduce the potential sources of lead contamination in drinking water in public schools that incorporates periodic, not to exceed biennial, testing of lead levels in drinking water sources at school facilities that were constructed prior to January 1, 1998. - Amends TCA Title 49; Title 68 and Title 69.
Title
As enacted, requires each local board of education to develop a policy to implement a program to reduce the potential sources of lead contamination in drinking water in public schools that incorporates periodic, not to exceed biennial, testing of lead levels in drinking water sources at school facilities that were constructed prior to January 1, 1998. - Amends TCA Title 49; Title 68 and Title 69.
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Harris [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-17 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 2 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-17 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 2 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Pub. Ch. 977 | |
2018-05-23 | Effective date(s) 01/01/2019 | |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-05-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-04-24 | House | Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-24 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0675) |
2018-04-24 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0953) |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA1101) |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/10/2018 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 2 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Education Committee |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Education Committee |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/14/2018 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0631 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 977