TN SB0615 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 253
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 253
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, repeals obsolete miscellaneous sanitary regulations for workshops, which includes any house, room, or place when used for the purpose of carrying on any process of making or altering, for sale or for wages, any coats, vests, trousers, knee pants, overalls, cloaks, shirts, waists, purses, feathers, artificial flowers, or cigars, or any wearing apparel of any kind whatsoever, intended for sale. - Repeals l TCA Title 68, Chapter 15, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, repeals obsolete miscellaneous sanitary regulations for workshops, which includes any house, room, or place when used for the purpose of carrying on any process of making or altering, for sale or for wages, any coats, vests, trousers, knee pants, overalls, cloaks, shirts, waists, purses, feathers, artificial flowers, or cigars, or any wearing apparel of any kind whatsoever, intended for sale. - Repeals l TCA Title 68, Chapter 15, Part 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 253 | |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2017 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/10/2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 4/12/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/5/2017 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0931 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-11 - Pub. Ch. 253