TN HB0931 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Pub. Ch. 253
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Pub. Ch. 253
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, repeals obsolete miscellaneous sanitary regulations for workshops, which includes any house, room, or place when used for the purpose of carrying on any process of making or altering, for sale or for wages, any coats, vests, trousers, knee pants, overalls, cloaks, shirts, waists, purses, feathers, artificial flowers, or cigars, or any wearing apparel of any kind whatsoever, intended for sale. - Repeals l TCA Title 68, Chapter 15, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, repeals obsolete miscellaneous sanitary regulations for workshops, which includes any house, room, or place when used for the purpose of carrying on any process of making or altering, for sale or for wages, any coats, vests, trousers, knee pants, overalls, cloaks, shirts, waists, purses, feathers, artificial flowers, or cigars, or any wearing apparel of any kind whatsoever, intended for sale. - Repeals l TCA Title 68, Chapter 15, Part 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Rudd [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Pub. Ch. 253 | |
2017-05-11 | Effective date(s) 05/02/2017 | |
2017-05-02 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-04-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-04-24 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-04-20 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-04-11 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-04-06 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/10/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/6/2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0615 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 253