TN SB0614 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/22/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/22/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, provides each member of a board created pursuant to the Interlocal Cooperation Act for the purpose of providing service to two or more counties with up to $300 per month compensation, the exact amount of which will be determined by resolution of such board; authorizes the board to provide certain other benefits. - Amends TCA Title 5, Chapter 16 and Title 12, Chapter 9.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5, Chapter 16 and Title 12, Chapter 9, relative to county boards of public utilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Effective date(s) 04/22/2021 | |
2021-05-03 | Pub. Ch. 200 | |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-09 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-05 | House | Passed H., Ayes 83, Nays 0, PNV 7 |
2021-04-05 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0056) |
2021-04-05 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-03-11 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0021) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/8/2021 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/2/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0205 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 200