TN SB0598 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows a person who is excluded as a candidate from a primary ballot based on a determination that the person is not a bona fide member of the political party to qualify as an independent candidate if the nominating petition is filed within seven calendar days of the final determination of the exclusion. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, relative to candidates.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-04 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/4/2023 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/4/2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/28/2023 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0636 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-13 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration