TN SB0593 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 410
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 410
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the statute of limitation for prosecution of second degree murder from 15 years from the offense to at any time after the offense is committed. - Amends TCA Section 39-13-210 and Title 40, Chapter 2.
Title
As enacted, extends the statute of limitation for prosecution of second degree murder from 15 years from the offense to at any time after the offense is committed. - Amends TCA Section 39-13-210 and Title 40, Chapter 2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 410 | |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/23/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0113 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 410