TN SB0592 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, establishes automatic registration of a person to vote when a person applies for a motor vehicle driver license or photo identification license. - Amends TCA Title 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, establishes automatic registration of a person to vote when a person applies for a motor vehicle driver license or photo identification license. - Amends TCA Title 2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
2018-03-21SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/27/2018
2018-02-20SenateReset on Final calendar of Senate State and Local Government Committee
2018-02-16SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/20/2018
2017-04-11SenateFailed in Senate State and Local Government Committee
2017-04-07SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-05SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/11/2017
2017-04-05SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/11/2017
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/5/2017
2017-04-04SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/5/2017
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/4/2017
2017-02-09SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2017-02-08SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-02-07SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0787 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-11 - Failed for lack of motion in: Local Government Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback