TN HB0787 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Failed for lack of motion in: Local Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, establishes automatic registration of a person to vote when a person applies for a motor vehicle driver license or photo identification license. - Amends TCA Title 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, establishes automatic registration of a person to vote when a person applies for a motor vehicle driver license or photo identification license. - Amends TCA Title 2.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-11HouseFailed for lack of motion in: Local Government Subcommittee
2017-04-05HousePlaced on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 4/11/2017
2017-04-04HouseAction Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 4/11/2017
2017-03-29HousePlaced on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 4/4/2017
2017-03-28HouseAction Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 4/4/2017
2017-03-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/28/2017
2017-03-21HouseAction Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 3/28/2017
2017-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/21/2017
2017-03-14HouseAction Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 3/21/2017
2017-03-08HousePlaced on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/14/2017
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
2017-02-13HouseP2C, ref. to Local Government Committee-- Government Operations for Review
2017-02-09HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-02-08HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0592 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback