TN SB0583 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes protection for residential facilities or providers licensed by the department of intellectual and developmental disabilities providing residential services to the elderly or adults with disabilities so long as the services are adequate with respect to the health, safety, and welfare of each resident. - Amends TCA Title 33.
Title
As introduced, removes protection for residential facilities or providers licensed by the department of intellectual and developmental disabilities providing residential services to the elderly or adults with disabilities so long as the services are adequate with respect to the health, safety, and welfare of each resident. - Amends TCA Title 33.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0413 (Crossfiled) 2015-02-18 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0583&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB0583.pdf |