TN HB0413 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes protection for residential facilities or providers licensed by the department of intellectual and developmental disabilities providing residential services to the elderly or adults with disabilities so long as the services are adequate with respect to the health, safety, and welfare of each resident. - Amends TCA Title 33.
Title
As introduced, removes protection for residential facilities or providers licensed by the department of intellectual and developmental disabilities providing residential services to the elderly or adults with disabilities so long as the services are adequate with respect to the health, safety, and welfare of each resident. - Amends TCA Title 33.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2015-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2015-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-05 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0583 (Crossfiled) 2015-02-12 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0413&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0413.pdf |