TN SB0583 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 757
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 757
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes provisions governing the school assignment and other education-related issues regarding juveniles adjudicated delinquent as result of certain acts. - Amends TCA Title 37 and Title 49.
Title
As enacted, establishes provisions governing the school assignment and other education-related issues regarding juveniles adjudicated delinquent as result of certain acts. - Amends TCA Title 37 and Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 757 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA1066) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/19/2013 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/19/2013 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/12/2013 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0477 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 757