TN SB0581 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-05 - Deferred to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Anti-Semitism Awareness Act." - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the "Anti-Semitism Awareness Act." - Amends TCA Title 49.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05SenateDeferred to Summer Study
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/5/2017
2017-04-04SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/5/2017
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/4/2017
2017-03-29SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/5/2017
2017-03-29SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-22SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2017
2017-02-09SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2017-02-08SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-02-07SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0885 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-05 - Def. to Summer Study in Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback