TN HB0885 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Def. to Summer Study in Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Anti-Semitism Awareness Act." - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the "Anti-Semitism Awareness Act." - Amends TCA Title 49.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05HouseDef. to Summer Study in Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee
2017-03-29HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 4/5/2017
2017-03-29HouseAction Def. in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee to 4/5/2017
2017-03-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
2017-03-21HouseAction Def. in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee to 3/29/2017
2017-03-21HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/21/2017
2017-03-08HouseAction Def. in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee to 3/22/2017
2017-03-01HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/8/2017
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee
2017-02-13HouseP2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
2017-02-09HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-02-08HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0581 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-05 - Deferred to Summer Study

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback