TN SB0569 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 446
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, replaces the awarding of treble damages under the Public Employee Political Freedom Act of 1980 with the awarding of compensatory damages. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 21 and Title 8, Chapter 50, Part 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, replaces the awarding of treble damages under the Public Employee Political Freedom Act of 1980 with the awarding of compensatory damages. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 21 and Title 8, Chapter 50, Part 6.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 446
2019-04-30SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2019-04-25SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019
2019-04-23SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/23/2019
2019-04-17SenateRe-refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-03-19SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/19/2019
2019-03-12SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/19/2019
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/12/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1087 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 446

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback