TN SB0569 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 446
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 446
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, replaces the awarding of treble damages under the Public Employee Political Freedom Act of 1980 with the awarding of compensatory damages. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 21 and Title 8, Chapter 50, Part 6.
Title
As enacted, replaces the awarding of treble damages under the Public Employee Political Freedom Act of 1980 with the awarding of compensatory damages. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 21 and Title 8, Chapter 50, Part 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 446 | |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/23/2019 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1087 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 446