TN SB0530 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-30 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to first calendar of 2022
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-30 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to first calendar of 2022
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes a uniform definition for medical necessity and medically necessary. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 39; Title 49; Title 50; Title 53; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 39; Title 49; Title 50; Title 53; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to health care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to first calendar of 2022 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0635 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-20 - Failed in Insurance Committee