TN SB0519 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-04 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-04 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands the offense of identity theft to include when someone knowingly obtains, possesses, buys, or uses the personal identifying information of another, including any dead or fictitious person, to obtain or attempt to obtain employment. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 14 and Title 47, Chapter 18.
Title
As introduced, expands the offense of identity theft to include when someone knowingly obtains, possesses, buys, or uses the personal identifying information of another, including any dead or fictitious person, to obtain or attempt to obtain employment. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 14 and Title 47, Chapter 18.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm. | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 03/04/2009 | |
2009-02-12 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2009-02-11 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-10 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0791 (Crossfiled) 2010-02-23 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Judiciary Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0519&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB0519.pdf |