TN SB0513 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department, no later than August 1, 2017, and by August 1 of each subsequent year, to report to the members of the house transportation committee and the senate transportation and safety committee of the general assembly the total number of traffic violations that involve motor vehicles operated by autonomous technology in each political subdivision of the state for the preceding fiscal year. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 39; Title 40; Title 54; Title 55; Title 56; Title 65 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, requires the department, no later than August 1, 2017, and by August 1 of each subsequent year, to report to the members of the house transportation committee and the senate transportation and safety committee of the general assembly the total number of traffic violations that involve motor vehicles operated by autonomous technology in each political subdivision of the state for the preceding fiscal year. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 39; Title 40; Title 54; Title 55; Title 56; Title 65 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Green [R] | Sen. Brian Kelsey [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/10/2017 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/27/2017 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/27/2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/20/2017 |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/13/2017 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0705 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-02 - Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 2018