TN HB0705 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-02 - Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 2018
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-02 - Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 2018
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department, no later than August 1, 2017, and by August 1 of each subsequent year, to report to the members of the house transportation committee and the senate transportation and safety committee of the general assembly the total number of traffic violations that involve motor vehicles operated by autonomous technology in each political subdivision of the state for the preceding fiscal year. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 39; Title 40; Title 54; Title 55; Title 56; Title 65 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, requires the department, no later than August 1, 2017, and by August 1 of each subsequent year, to report to the members of the house transportation committee and the senate transportation and safety committee of the general assembly the total number of traffic violations that involve motor vehicles operated by autonomous technology in each political subdivision of the state for the preceding fiscal year. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 39; Title 40; Title 54; Title 55; Title 56; Title 65 and Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 2018 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-11 | House | Action def. in Transportation Committee to 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Action def. in Transportation Committee to 4/11/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0513 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-13 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.