TN SB0500 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-18 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-18 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes standards for stationary assembly points and mobile labor camps provided by a railroad company for maintenance of way employees; requires the department of health to adopt rules pertaining to mobile camps. - Amends TCA Title 65 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, establishes standards for stationary assembly points and mobile labor camps provided by a railroad company for maintenance of way employees; requires the department of health to adopt rules pertaining to mobile camps. - Amends TCA Title 65 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-28 - Senate - S. TRANS COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-18 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm. | |
2009-06-18 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/18/2009 | |
2009-06-16 | Action def. in FW&M Comm to 6-17-09 | |
2009-06-16 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/16/2009 | |
2009-06-15 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 6/16/2009 | |
2009-06-15 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/15/2009 | |
2009-06-12 | Action def. in FW&M Comm to 6/15/2009 | |
2009-06-11 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/12/2009 | |
2009-06-11 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 6/12/2009 | |
2009-06-11 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/11/2009 | |
2009-06-10 | Action def. in FW&M Comm to 6/11/2009 | |
2009-06-10 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/10/2009 | |
2009-06-09 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 6/10/2009 | |
2009-06-04 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/09/2009 | |
2009-06-03 | Action def. in S. F,W&M Comm. to next cal. | |
2009-06-02 | Action def. in S. F,W&M Comm to 6/3/09 | |
2009-05-28 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/02/2009 | |
2009-04-28 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. FW&M Comm. | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 04/28/2009 | |
2009-04-21 | Action Def. in S. Trans Comm. to 4/28/2009 | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 04/21/2009 | |
2009-04-14 | Action Def. in S. Trans Comm. to 4/21/2009 | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 04/14/2009 | |
2009-02-12 | P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm. | |
2009-02-11 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-10 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1610 (Crossfiled) 2010-02-10 - Action Def. in s/c Rural Roads of TR to Call of the Chair