TN SB0499 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-28 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to last calendar of 2024
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-28 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to last calendar of 2024
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from 10 days to 10 business days the time period for written notice to members when the president of the district public defenders conference calls a meeting at will. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 14 and Title 9, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 14 and Title 9, Chapter 4, relative to district public defenders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to last calendar of 2024 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2023 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Sponsor change. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1352 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-02 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.