TN SB0493 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces, from 60 days to 30 days, the time within which a district attorney general may respond with recommendations on a petition for expunction of a criminal conviction. - Amends TCA Section 8-21-401 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 8-21-401 and Title 40, relative to expunction.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1175 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-24 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.