TN SB0492 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 863
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 863
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that a property tax lien does not attach to an easement appurtenant upon property that is a servient estate or to an easement in gross that was assessed separately from the property by either the county assessor of property or the office of state assessed properties in the office of the comptroller of the treasury. - Amends TCA Title 7; Title 8; Title 21; Title 26; Title 35; Title 40; Title 66 and Title 67.
Title
As enacted, specifies that a property tax lien does not attach to an easement appurtenant upon property that is a servient estate or to an easement in gross that was assessed separately from the property by either the county assessor of property or the office of state assessed properties in the office of the comptroller of the treasury. - Amends TCA Title 7; Title 8; Title 21; Title 26; Title 35; Title 40; Title 66 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-10 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 863 | |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/18/18 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/10/2018 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/27/2018 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0601 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 863