TN SB0485 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 294
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 294
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes a plaintiff in certain civil actions filed against an owner and operator of an uninsured motor vehicle, where comparative fault is or becomes an issue, to amend the complaint to add certain persons as defendants or institute a separate action against such persons within a certain time following the filing of the first answer or first amended answer alleging such person's fault if such actions would otherwise be barred by the statute of limitations and other criteria is met. - Amends TCA Title 20, Chapter 1, Part 1 and Title 56, Chapter 7, Part 12.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 20, Chapter 1, Part 1 and Title 56, Chapter 7, Part 12, relative to civil actions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 294 | |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/6/2023 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2023 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Sponsor change. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0187 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-02 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023