TN SB0477 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective date(s) 4/28/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective date(s) 4/28/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes changes to law relative to convenient voting centers, including authorizing Henry County to establish a convenient voting center pilot program. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 3, Part 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, Chapter 3, Part 3, relative to convenient voting centers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 2 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 1 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 1 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Effective date(s) 4/28/2023 | |
2023-05-03 | Pub. Ch. 262 | |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2023-04-20 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 (Amendment 2 - HA0360) |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0215) |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/17/2023 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/17/2023 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/13/2023 |
2023-04-10 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 86, Nays 6, PNV 2 |
2023-04-10 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0360) |
2023-04-10 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0215) |
2023-04-10 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2023-04-06 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/3/2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2023 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Sponsor change. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0632 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 262