TN HB0632 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 262
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 262
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes changes to law relative to convenient voting centers, including authorizing Henry County to establish a convenient voting center pilot program. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 3, Part 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, Chapter 3, Part 3, relative to convenient voting centers.
Sponsors
Rep. Tandy Darby [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 262 | |
2023-04-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-10 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2023-04-06 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/10/2023 |
2023-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/6/2023 |
2023-04-04 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/4/2023 |
2023-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2023-03-21 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/15/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Action Def. in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee to 3/15/2023 |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/8/2023 |
2023-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2023-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0477 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Effective date(s) 4/28/2023